VA SB639 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-30 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB441-Howell) (15-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-30 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB441-Howell) (15-Y 0-N)
Summary
Crime victims and witnesses; immigration status. Prohibits law enforcement from questioning or investigating the immigration status of a person who reports that he was a victim of or witness to a crime. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Crime victims and witnesses; immigration status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-30 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB441-Howell) (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Immigration | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086126336 |
Same As/Similar To
SB441 (Similar To) 2008-03-05 - House: VOTE: --- RECONSIDER DEFEATED (45-Y 53-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB639 |