VA SB639 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation construction, operation and maintenance, and funding. Provides for the construction, maintenance, and funding of transportation by (i) increasing transportation's share of year-end surpluses to 67 percent, and (ii) authorizing the Commonwealth Transportation Board (CTB) to name highways, bridges, interchanges, and other transportation facilities for private entities if an annual naming rights fee is paid, with the revenue dedicated to highway maintenance and operation. The bill also charges the CTB with greater responsibilities involving integration of land use and transportation planning and authorizes the CTB to withhold federal and state funds for certain local or regional capital improvement projects if those projects are inconsistent with the Statewide Transportation Plan or the Six-Year Improvement Program. Provision is made for use of "revenue-sharing" funds for secondary highway system maintenance projects carried out by local governments. The bill provides for special allocations by the CTB for bridge reconstruction, high priority highway projects, and reconstruction of highways with particularly deteriorated pavements. Finally, the bill establishes an annual $50 license tax for electric motor vehicles registered in the Commonwealth.
Title
Transportation; provides revenues for construction, maintenance, and funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 36-N) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (11-Y 27-N) (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (12-Y 25-N) (Y: 12 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 69 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 36-N) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (11-Y 27-N) (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (12-Y 25-N) (Y: 12 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 69 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 733 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-17 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB639ER) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Chair votes Yes | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 20-N) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 12106047D-S2 | |
2012-03-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 36-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (58-Y 36-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Delegates: Lingamfelter, Jones, Dance | |
2012-03-06 | House: Second conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-06 | House: House acceded to request for second conference committee | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Senators: Wagner, Watkins, Puckett | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Second conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Senate requested second conference committee | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-02-29 | House: Delegates: Lingamfelter, Jones, Dance | |
2012-02-29 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Senators: Wagner, Watkins, Puckett | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-02-27 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (11-Y 27-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (12-Y 25-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Passed House with substitute (67-Y 32-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB639H1 | |
2012-02-22 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105514D-H1 | |
2012-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105514D-H1 | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 8-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB639S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105116D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105116D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12101931D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1248 (Same As) 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Transportation
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1509.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 23.04:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 23.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 23.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 466 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 469 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 470 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 488 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 49.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 638 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |