VA SB639 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Social Services; plan for national background checks for child care providers. Directs the Department of Social Services to convene a work group to review current state and federal laws and regulations governing criminal history background checks for child-care providers and to develop a plan for implementation of national fingerprint-based criminal history background checks for all child care providers in the Commonwealth, and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2014.
Title
Child care; Department of Social Services to plan for national background checks for providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 379 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB639ER) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103600D |
Same As/Similar To
HB412 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
Subjects
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Criminal Procedure
Minors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare (Social Services)
Criminal Procedure
Minors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare (Social Services)