VA SB639 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health care shared savings; incentive programs. Requires health carriers to establish a comparable health care service incentive program under which savings are shared with a covered person who elects to receive a covered health care service from a lower-cost provider. Incentive payments shall be at least 50 percent of the saved cost compared to the average cost. Incentive payments are not required for savings of $25 or less. Programs are required to be approved by the Commissioner of Insurance. The measure also requires health carriers to make available an interactive mechanism on their website that enables a covered person to compare costs between providers in-network, calculate estimated out-of-pocket costs, and obtain quality data for those providers, to the extent available. The measure authorizes covered persons to obtain health care services from out-of-network providers if their costs are below the average of in-network providers. The measure requires health care facilities and practitioners to provide a covered person an estimate of charges prior to an admission, procedure, or service. All health care providers are required to post in a visible area notification of the patient's ability to obtain information in order to get an estimate of out-of-pocket costs from his health carrier and to compare providers.
Title
Health care shared savings; incentive programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Richard Black [R] | Sen. Amanda Chase [R] | Sen. Glen Sturtevant [R] |
Sen. Frank Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106135D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104607D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 134.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3461 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3466 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2962.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |