VA SB639 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arrest and prosecution when experiencing or reporting overdoses. Clarifies that the immunity afforded to the seeking of emergency help for an overdose also applies to a show cause order. Arrest and prosecution when experiencing or reporting overdoses. Clarifies that the immunity afforded to the seeking of emergency help for an overdose also applies to a show cause order.
Title
Overdoses; arrest and prosecution when experiencing or reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22103752D-E |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB639E |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103752D |