VA SB643 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health information needs; Department of Health work group. Requires the Department of Health to establish a work group to examine the health information needs related to health care reform and to ensure that any new data collection is integrated with existing practices in an efficient manner.
Title
Health information; Department of Health to establish work group to examine needs related to reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103800D |
Same As/Similar To
SB135 (Similar To) 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709)