VA SB643 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
U.S. Department of the Interior; monitoring by VMRC; Assateague Island National Seashore. Directs the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to monitor any effort by the U.S. Department of the Interior to expand federal jurisdiction regarding fishing or shellfish harvesting in the waters adjoining the Assateague Island National Seashore and to seek to preserve the right and ability of Virginia watermen to use such waters.
Title
U.S. Department of the Interior; monitoring by VMRC, Assateague Island National Seashore.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067) | |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 67 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 29, 2016 | |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/22/16 |
2016-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB643ER) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16103604D |