VA SB66 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nondiscrimination in state employment. Prohibits discrimination in public employment based on race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, age, marital status, disability, sexual orientation, or status as a special disabled veteran or other veteran covered by the Vietnam Era Veterans Readjustment Assistance Act of 1974, as amended. The bill defines "sexual orientation" as a person's actual or perceived heterosexuality, bisexuality, homosexuality, or gender identity or expression. The bill expressly provides that "sexual orientation" shall not include any person's attraction toward persons with whom sexual conduct would be illegal due to the age of the parties. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
State employment; discrimination prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (55-Y 42-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Motion to pass by the Motion to discharge from General Laws agreed to (55-Y 42-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Amendment by Senator McEachin withdrawn | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101322D |