VA SB663 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
Summary
Local fees for companion animals. Removes the cap that localities may charge for the burial or cremation of animals and authorizes localities to charge increased fees for the repeated impoundment of the same animal.
Title
Companion animals; authorizes localities to charge for the repeated impoundment thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 345 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB663ER) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-02-22 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-20 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB663S1 | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083263204-S1 | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083263204-S1 | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 084576744 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB663 |