VA SB663 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia community college mental health services pilot program. Requires the Virginia Community College System to create a pilot program to establish a plan or contract with community groups or both to provide mental health services to uninsured students and such other students as the System may identify at eight community college campuses in the Commonwealth, as determined by the System. The bill requires a central program manager for the pilot program. The bill provides that the provision of mental health services will continue through June 30, 2016, or until funds are no longer available, whichever occurs sooner.
Title
Community college mental health services; Virginia Community College System to create pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2015 in Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2015 in Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104814D-S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103861D |