VA SB665 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic Identity Management Act; federated digital identity systems. Amends the Electronic Identity Management Act to accommodate federated digital identity systems. A federated digital identity system (federation) is defined in the measure as a digital identity system that uses federated identity management to enable the portability of identity information across otherwise autonomous security domains. Federated identity management is defined in the measure as a process that allows the conveyance of identity credentials and authentication information across digital identity systems through the use of a common set of policies, practices, and protocols for managing the identity of users and devices across security domains. The digital identity systems involved in a federation are required to be compliant with the Commonwealth's identity management standards and with the provisions of the governing identity trust framework.
Title
Electronic Identity Management Act; definitions, federated digital identity systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 736 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB665ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed House (93-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (18-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Communications |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB665S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108035D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108035D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102986D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 553 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 555 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |