VA SB666 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0143)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0143)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Issuance of certain special license plates. Prohibits the DMV from issuing to registered sex offenders special license plates relating to children or children's programs or with revenues paid to funds for the benefit of children or renewing the registration of a vehicle that has been issued such license plates. The bill also provides that DMV shall not issue or renew personalized license plates to registered sex offenders if the requested personalization relates to or references children.
Title
License plates, special; prohibits DMV from issuing certain plates to registered sex offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0143) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 143 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2016 | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/16 |
2016-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB666ER) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB666S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104799D-S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104799D-S1 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16103999D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1190 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0430)