VA SB666 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; notification of denial. Requires notice of a denial of an application for voter registration to be provided by the general registrar to the applicant within five days of the denial. This notice is required to be given in writing and by email or telephone if that information was provided by the applicant. The bill requires the registration application to request that the applicant provide his telephone number and email address. If the general registrar is able to reach the applicant by telephone, corrections may be made by the applicant by telephone. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Voter registration; notification of denial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 857 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB666ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (20-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendments (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed bill reprinted 20101350D-E |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20101350D-E |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB666E |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101350D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 422 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |