VA SB666 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offenses prohibiting proximity to children; state parks; penalty. Provides that every adult who is convicted of an offense prohibiting proximity to children, when the offense occurred on or after July 1, 2024, shall as part of his sentence be forever prohibited from going, for the purpose of having any contact whatsoever with children who are not in his custody, within 100 feet of the premises of any area of a state park where he knows or has reason to know that children are present. A violation is a Class 6 felony.
Title
Sex offenses; prohibiting proximity to children in state parks, penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Danny Diggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24104207D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1368 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice