VA SB678 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Definition of agricultural operation. Amends the definition of "agricultural operation" for purposes of the Right to Farm Act to include the housing of livestock. The bill provides that this change is declaratory of existing law. Definition of agricultural operation. Amends the definition of "agricultural operation" for purposes of the Right to Farm Act to include the housing of livestock. The bill provides that this change is declaratory of existing law.
Title
Agricultural operation; amends definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB678ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendment (52-Y 45-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104182D |