VA SB684 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Summary
Elections; provisional ballot procedures. Corrects a reference in the Code concerning the handling of provisional ballots to clarify that the information provided by the persons casting provisional ballots will be entered in the precinct provisional ballots log rather than in the pollbook for the precinct. This bill is identical to
Title
Provisional ballot procedures; corrects reference in Code concerning handling thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 110 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB684ER) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-15 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-01-15 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 087662212 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1455 (Same As) 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB684 |