VA SB686 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; electronic titling. Allows the Department of Motor Vehicles to establish an electronic titling program for new motor vehicles.
Title
Electronic titling program; allows DMV to establish for new motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Garrett [R] | Sen. Ryan McDougle [R] | Sen. Jeffrey McWaters [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] |
Sen. William Stanley [R] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650) | |
2012-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB686ER) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-28 | House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2012-02-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read first time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12105146D | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Introduced at the request of Governor |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1542 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1561 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 603.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 623 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 629 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |