VA SB710 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - Incorporated by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - Incorporated by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Trafficking in persons; penalties. Creates new felonies for trafficking in persons for forced labor or sexual servitude and adds the new felonies as a predicate criminal act under the criminal gang statute, as racketeering crimes, adds their investigation to the functions of a multijurisdiction grand jury, and also allows seizure and forfeiture of property used in committing such felonies. The new felonies and the existing felony of receiving money for procuring a person are added to the rape shield statute. The bill allows a petition for a child in need of services to be substituted for a delinquency petition for certain minors arrested for prostitution, disallows the release of certain victim information, specifies law-enforcement protocol for victims who may not be legally present, requires persons convicted of the new felonies to pay restitution that compensates for the victim's labor, and creates a civil action for trafficked persons. The Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security is required to convene an anti-trafficking committee and the Virginia Prevention of Human Trafficking Victim Fund is created, which will be administered by the Department of Criminal Justice Services.
Title
Human trafficking; new felonies created, penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | Senate | Incorporated by Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104515D-S1 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100898D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1188 (Similar To) 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 346 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 50.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 224.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 42.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 116.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |