VA SB710 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Maximum number of judges in each judicial district and circuit. Increases by one the maximum number of authorized juvenile and domestic relations district court judges in the Twentieth and Thirty-first Judicial Districts. The bill also increases by one the maximum number of authorized circuit court judges in the First, Ninth, Fifteenth, and Twenty-fifth Judicial Circuits. This bill is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts and the Judicial Council of Virginia.
Title
Judges; maximum number each judicial district and circuit.
Sponsors
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] | Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] |
Sen. Russet Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Obenshain rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Obenshain rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB710ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-05 | House | Delegates: Hope, Simon, Green |
2024-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Deeds, Carroll Foy, Obenshain |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (95-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (95-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB710H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107801D-H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107801D-H1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB710S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Obenshain rejected (19-Y 21-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106222D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Incorporates SB686 (McPike) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106222D-S1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24103420D |
Same As/Similar To
HB310 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Courts Not of Record
Courts of Record
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Judicial Circuits
Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Courts
Courts Not of Record
Courts of Record
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Judicial Circuits
Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Courts