VA SB722 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance credits for retired school division employees. Expands the recipients of the health insurance credits currently going to retired teachers to all retired employees of local school divisions at the option of the local school division and as a cost borne by the local government to which the local school division is affiliated.
Title
Health insurance; credits for retired school division employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-03-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB722S1 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104967D-S1 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104967D-S1 | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104589D |