VA SB725 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House: Passed by indefinitely in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House: Passed by indefinitely in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax; sales tax holiday for certain hurricane preparedness equipment. Adds portable pet carriers to the list of hurricane preparedness items that are exempt from the sales and use tax during the week of May 25 through May 31 each year.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemptions include pet carriers to list of hurricane preparedness items.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | House: Passed by indefinitely in Finance by voice vote | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10101845D | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |