VA SB729 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary jail facilities; Chesapeake. Allows the City of Chesapeake to receive a waiver from the construction requirements of the "Standards for Planning, Design, Construction and Reimbursement of Local Correctional Facilities" for a jail enlargement project using a temporary structure for housing community custody inmates. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Jail facilities, temporary; Chesapeake allowed certain waivers for current temporary structures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 453 (effective 3/16/13) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB729ER) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB729S1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104479D-S1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104479D-S1 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/12 13100924D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1635 (Same As) 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)