VA SB729 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Credit life and credit accident and sickness insurance; reports. Removes the requirement that insurers file annual reports with the State Corporation Commission regarding the credit life and credit accident and sickness insurance they have written. The same reports will continue to be required to be filed with the National Association of Insurance Commissioners.
Title
Credit life and credit accident and sickness insurance; reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 11 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, February 27, 2015 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/20/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB729ER) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101314D |