VA SB77 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nutrient Trading Act; penalty. Directs the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board to adopt regulations governing the certification of certain nutrient credits. Referring to Chesapeake Bay Total Maximum Daily Loads (TMDLs), the legislation sets out certain requirements of the regulations, directs the Department of Conservation and Recreation to establish an online registry of certified credits, and provides for enforcement and appeals. The bill provides that an operator of a credit-generating facility found to be in violation of the Nutrient Trading Act or any attendant regulations shall be subject to a civil penalty not exceeding $10,000.
Title
Nutrient credit certification; regulations, Nutrient Trading Act is established, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 808 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB77ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (91-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB77ER) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Title replaced 12105436D-H1 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0- N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2012-02-24 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105436D-H1 | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-22 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105436D-H1 | |
2012-02-22 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB77S1 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105049D-S1 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105049D-S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100896D |
Same As/Similar To
HB176 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 603.8:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 603.8:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.19:13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.19:15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.19:18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.19:20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |