VA SB77 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disposition of remains; absence of next of kin. Provides that, in the absence of a next of kin, a person designated to make arrangements for disposition of a decedent's remains, an agent named in an advance directive, or a guardian who exercises powers conferred in an order of appointment, or upon the failure or refusal of such next of kin, designated person, agent, or guardian to accept responsibility for the disposition of the decedent's remains, any person who is 18 years of age or older who is able to provide identification of the deceased and willing to pay the costs of disposition of the remains may make arrangements for such disposition and may authorize cremation. The bill also provides that a funeral service establishment or funeral service licensee who makes arrangements in accordance with the provisions of this act shall be immune from civil liability absent bad faith or malicious intent.
Title
Dead human bodies; absence of next of kin, disposition of remains, prerequisites for cremation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 355 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB77ER) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 14104981D-H1 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB77H1 |
2014-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104981D-H1 |
2014-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104981D-H1 |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB77S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104037D-S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104037D-S1 |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100296D |