VA SB77 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; reassessment cycles. Authorizes counties to conduct a general reassessment of real estate every three years if determined by majority vote of a county's board of supervisors. Current law requires counties to conduct a general reassessment every four years, with exceptions authorized for specified counties.
Title
Real property tax; assessment cycles by counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 8-N) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 362 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB77ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (92-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (92-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102631D |
Same As/Similar To
HB951 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
HB951 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
HB951 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)