VA SB79 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Solar-ready roofs for certain government buildings; net-zero energy consumption building design for schools. Requires any executive branch agency or institution and any locality entering the design phase for the construction of a new building greater than 5,000 gross square feet in size, or the renovation of a building where the cost of the renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building, to ensure that such building includes infrastructure for renewable energy systems. The bill also requires the Department of Energy to convene a work group to make recommendations on how to implement renovations to existing public school buildings and facilities. The provisions of this bill only apply to projects entering the design phase on or after January 1, 2026. Solar-ready roofs for certain government buildings; net-zero energy consumption building design for schools. Requires any executive branch agency or institution and any locality entering the design phase for the construction of a new building greater than 5,000 gross square feet in size, or the renovation of a building where the cost of the renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building, to ensure that such building includes infrastructure for renewable energy systems. The bill also requires the Department of Energy to convene a work group to make recommendations on how to implement renovations to existing public school buildings and facilities. The provisions of this bill only apply to projects entering the design phase on or after January 1, 2026.
Title
Government buildings, certain; net-zero energy consumption building design for schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107927D-H1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB79S2 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Finance and Appropriations Committee substitute agreed to 24107199D-S2 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-08 | Senate | General Laws and Technology Committee substitute rejected 24106062D-S1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107199D-S2 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106062D-S1 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2023-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103593D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1456 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations