VA SB91 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB91
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Application of parole statutes. Repeals the abolition of parole. The bill also provides that the Virginia Parole Board shall establish procedures for consideration of parole for persons who were previously ineligible for parole, because parole was abolished, to allow for an extension of time for reasonable cause.
Title
Parole; application of statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Incorporates SB809 (Morrissey) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20107456D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100438D |
Same As/Similar To
SB91 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 165.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 165.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |