VA SB92 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System. Provides that the supplemental allowance currently paid to members upon retirement until age 65 would instead be paid until Social Security Retirement Age. This will only become effective upon an appropriation of general funds effectuating the purposes of the bill passed by the 2010 General Assembly.
Title
Law Officers' Retirement System; allowance would be paid until social security retirement age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-03-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10101091D-E | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB92E | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-06 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101091D |