VA SB927 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; disqualification; presiding officers and hearing officers. Establishes a process for the disqualification of presiding officers and hearing officers in situations where such officers cannot accord a fair and impartial hearing or consideration or when required by the applicable rules governing the practice of law. A presiding officer or hearing officer shall be subject to disqualification for any factor leading a reasonable person to question his impartiality, including prejudice, financial interest, and ex parte communications. The bill establishes a process for challenging the initial decision to not disqualify. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Administrative Process Act; process for disqualification of a hearing officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 636 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB927ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15100894D-E |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB927E |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Edwards agreed to |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100894D |