VA SB938 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fees collected by circuit court clerks for recording and indexing; use of fee in preserving permanent records of the circuit courts. Increases by $2 the fees for the recording and indexing of certain documents. The bill further increases from $1.50 to $3.50 the portion of the recording and indexing fee collected by circuit court clerks that is designated for use in preserving the permanent records of the circuit courts.
Title
Circuit court clerks; fees collected for recording and indexing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 653 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB938ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (85-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20102909D |
Same As/Similar To
HB306 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)