VA SB969 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); exception to open meeting requirements. Clarifies that the gathering or attendance of two or more members of a public body (i) at any place or function where no part of the purpose of such gathering or attendance is the discussion or transaction of any public business, and such gathering or attendance was not called or prearranged with any purpose of discussing or transacting any business of the public body, or (ii) at a public forum, candidate appearance, or debate, the purpose of which is to inform the electorate and not to transact public business or to hold discussions relating to the transaction of public business, even though the performance of the members individually or collectively in the conduct of public business may be a topic of discussion or debate at such public meeting, is not a meeting under FOIA. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; exception to open meeting requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 131 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB969ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2015-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101552D |