VA SJR131 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Abraham Lincoln Day in Virginia. Designates February 12, in 2012 and in each succeeding year, as Abraham Lincoln Day in Virginia. This resolution is a recommendation of the Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Commission.
Title
Abraham Lincoln Day; designating as February 12, 2012 and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 12104476D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+SJ131 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SJ131+hil |