VA SJR134 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ134ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ134ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Karen Dickerson.
Title
Commending Karen Dickerson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ134ER) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2012-02-07 | House: Taken up for immediate consideration | |
2012-02-03 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2012-02-03 | House: Received | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 12104394D | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Presented 12104394D |