VA SJR153 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ153ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ153ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Fairfax County Public Library.
Title
Commending the Fairfax County Public Library.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] |
Sen. Stella Pekarsky [D] | Sen. Saddam Salim [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ153ER) |
2024-03-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-03-01 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-03-01 | House | Received |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Presented 24108337D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR257 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ257ER)