VA SJR159 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ159ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ159ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Naval Air Crewman 2nd Class James P. Buriak, USN.
Title
Celebrating the life of Naval Air Crewman 2nd Class James P. Buriak, USN.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ159ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House |
2022-03-04 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-03-04 | House | Received |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Presented 22106638D |