VA SJR159 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ159ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ159ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of George Declan O'Reilly.
Title
Celebrating the life of George Declan O'Reilly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ159ER) |
2024-03-04 | House | Agreed to by House |
2024-03-01 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-03-01 | House | Received |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Presented 24108114D |