VA SJR17 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ17ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ17ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Friday Night Live!
Title
Commending Friday Night Live!
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ17ER) |
2020-01-13 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-01-10 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2020-01-10 | House | Received |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/08/20 20100656D |