VA SJR231 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Fredericksburg Civil Rights Trail.
Title
Commending the Fredericksburg Civil Rights Trail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2024-03-09 | House | No further action taken |
2024-03-09 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-06 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-03-06 | House | Received |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Presented 24108424D |
Same As/Similar To
HR420 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Bill text as passed House (HR420ER)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+SJ231 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SJ231+hil |