VA SJR63 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ63ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ63ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
General Thaddeus Kosciuszko Day. Designates October 15, in 2018 and in each succeeding year, as General Thaddeus Kosciuszko Day in Virginia. The resolution is identical to HJ 64.
Title
General Thaddeus Kosciuszko Day; designating as October 15, 2018, & each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ63ER) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Taken up |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18100466D |