VA SJR63 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ63ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ63ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Robert Casto.
Title
Commending Robert Casto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ63ER) |
2022-01-31 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-01-28 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-01-28 | House | Received |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Presented 22104643D |