VA SJR71 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Joint Commission on Health Care; placement options for individuals with brain injury, post-traumatic stress disorder, or dementia who experience aggression; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Health Care (the Commission) to study placement options for individuals with brain injury, post-traumatic stress disorder, or dementia who experience aggression. In conducting the study, the Commission shall identify the various placement options and identify the barriers to placement for such individuals and make recommendations for improving access to safe, appropriate placements. The Commission shall complete its work by November 30, 2017.
Title
Individuals with brain injury, etc.; Joint Commission on Health Care to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Rules |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101513D |