VA SJR73 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ73ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ73ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Continuing the Joint Subcommittee to Study Substance Abuse Treatment and Prevention. Continues the Joint Subcommittee to Study Strategies and Models for Substance Abuse Prevention and Treatment for one additional year. To assist the joint subcommittee in its work, the Bureau of Insurance shall collect data and information on the coverage provided by health insurers, health services plans, and health maintenance organizations for substance abuse treatment services. The Department of Health Professions shall collect data and information about utilization of the Prescription Monitoring Program by prescribers and dispensers of controlled substances and responses to notification sent by the Department to prescribers. The Bureau of Insurance and the Department of Health Professions must report their findings to the joint subcommittee, which must include such findings in its final report to the 2011 Regular Session of the General Assembly. This resolution incorporates
Title
Strategy & Model for Substance Abuse Prevention & Treatment, Joint Subcommittee Studying; continued.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ73ER) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Title replaced 10105807D-H1 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Agreed to by House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ73H1 | |
2010-03-09 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105807D-H1 | |
2010-03-09 | House: Taken up | |
2010-03-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105807D-H1 | |
2010-03-04 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103347D |