VA SJR73 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Social Services; feasibility of lessening restrictions of barrier crime statutes applicable to kinship foster care and adoptive placements in the Commonwealth; report. Requests the Department of Social Services (the Department) to (i) review the Commonwealth's current barrier crime statutes that apply to kinship foster care and adoptive placements, (ii) assess the feasibility of lessening and formulate recommendations to lessen the restrictions of such statutes in a manner that would promote kinship foster care and adoptive placements while continuing to ensure the safe placement of children, and (iii) consult with all relevant stakeholders. The resolution requests that the Department present its findings and recommendations to the Commission on Youth and that the Department submit to the Governor and the General Assembly an executive summary and report no later than the first day of the 2017 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Kinship foster care and adoptive placements; DSS to study restrictions of barrier crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Rules |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101541D |