VA SJR75 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ75ER)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ75ER)
Summary
Study; continuing the Joint Subcommittee to Study the Comprehensive Services Program for At-Risk Youth and Families; report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee to Study the Comprehensive Services Program for At-Risk Youth and Families, established by Senate Joint Resolution 96 (2006), to continue to review the administration of the Comprehensive Services Program and to develop additional legislative recommendations for the 2009 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Comprehensive Services Program for At-Risk Youth & Families Program; Joint Subcommittee Studying.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ75ER) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Taken up | |
2008-03-03 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 083184232-E | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ75E | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083184232 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ75 |