VA SJR75 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House: Incorporated by Rules (SJ73-Hanger) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House: Incorporated by Rules (SJ73-Hanger) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Prescription Monitoring Program; report. Requests that the Department of Health Professions collect data on and information about use of the Prescription Monitoring Program by prescribers and dispensers of controlled substances and responses to notifications of substantial or unusual activity or potential misuse of prescription drugs sent by the Department to prescribers. This bill is incorporated into
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; DHP to collect data about utilization by prescribers & dispensers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | House: Incorporated by Rules (SJ73-Hanger) by voice vote | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (SJ73-Hanger) by voice vote | |
2010-03-01 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103344D-E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ75E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103344D |