VA SJR77 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER)
Summary
Study; substance abuse and prevention programs. Creates a joint subcommittee to study strategies and models for substance abuse prevention and treatment that effectively reduce the costly service demands created by substance abuse. In conducting its study, the joint subcommittee shall (i) identify and characterize the nature of substance abuse in the Commonwealth; (ii) identify current state policies and programs targeting substance abuse prevention and treatment; (iii) examine the cost of such policies and programs to the Commonwealth; (iv) identify and examine policies and prevention programs from other leading states in the field of substance abuse and prevention; and (v) benchmark the Commonwealth's substance abuse prevention and treatment programs and policies against those of the leading states.
Title
Substance abuse; joint subcommittee to study strategies and models for prevention and treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Taken up | |
2008-03-03 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 086209232-E | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ77E | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086209232 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ77 |