VA SJR77 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments; January 12. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor McAuliffe and communicated to the General Assembly January 12, 2018.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER) |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-06 | House | Taken up |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18105166D-E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ77E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105166D |