VA SJR78 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
United States Constitution; Equal Rights Amendment. Ratifies the Equal Rights Amendment to the United States Constitution that was proposed by Congress in 1972. This joint resolution advocates the position that the 1972 Equal Rights Amendment remains viable and may be ratified notwithstanding the expiration of the 10-year ratification period set out in the resolving clause, as amended, in the proposal adopted by Congress.
Title
United States Constitution; General Assembly to ratify and affirm Equal Rights Amendment.
Sponsors
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] | Sen. Louise Lucas [D] |
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (25-Y 8-N) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2014-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-24 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (25-Y 8-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules (16-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103517D |