VA SJR78 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ78ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ78ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Gerald Thomas Halpin.
Title
Celebrating the life of Gerald Thomas Halpin.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Saslaw [D] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. John Edwards [D] |
Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] | Sen. Frank Wagner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ78ER) |
2018-02-02 | House | Agreed to by House |
2018-01-26 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2018-01-26 | House | Received |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented 18100273D |